IL HB1914 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that no special fund shall be subject to sweeps, administrative charge-backs, or any other fiscal or budgetary maneuver that would in any way transfer any amounts from a special fund into any other fund of the State. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-SPECIAL FUND SWEEP
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Rosenthal [R] | Rep. Harry Ramey [R] | Rep. Jim Watson [R] | Rep. Adam Brown [R] |
Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. Bill Mitchell [R] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] | Rep. Raymond Poe [R] |
Rep. Rich Brauer [R] | Rep. Richard Morthland [R] | Rep. Pam Roth [R] | Rep. Kay Hatcher [R] |
Rep. Mike Fortner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2011-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
2011-02-23 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |