IL HB2145 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0026
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0026
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill but with the following changes: Further amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law, the Asbestos Abatement Act, the Lead Poisoning Prevention Act, and the Illinois Plumbing License Law by adding cross-references to those provisions of the Workers' Compensation Act that concern an employer's obligation to annually file with the Illinois Workers' Compensation Commission an application for approval as a self-insurer and a current financial statement. In various provisions concerning licensing, provides that no license shall be suspended or revoked until after the licensee is afforded any due process protection guaranteed by statute or rule adopted by the Workers' Compensation Commission or the Department of Insurance. Effective January 1, 2024.
Title
DFPR-WORK COMP REQUIREMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0026 |
2023-06-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-06-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-02 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-05 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2023 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-000 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2023-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000 |
2023-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000 |
2023-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 105 | 10a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2105 | 2105-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2105 | 2105-207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 320 | 13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 45 | 8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |