IL HB2228 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Trusts and Trustees Act. Makes technical changes in a Section concerning the Act's short title.
Title
CIVIL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-06 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-004-000 |
2011-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-03-17 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 15, 2011 |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-03-16 | House | Re-assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-03-07 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
760 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |