IL HB2272 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0088
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0088
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code to provide that the governing bodies of contract schools are subject to the Freedom of Information Act and Open Meetings Act.
Title
SCH CD-TEACHERS-EVALUATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0088 |
2019-07-19 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-039-001 |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-03 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-03-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-12 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-03-12 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-02-14 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-17a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.25g | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24-16.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24-9.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 24A-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24A-5.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 24A-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-84 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-85c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
115 | 5 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |