IL HB2326 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires that on or before July 1, 2020, the Department of Insurance and Department of Healthcare and Family Services to jointly develop a uniform prior authorization form to be used by prescribing providers to request prior authorization for prescription drug benefits. Provides that on and after January 1, 2021 or 6 months after the uniform prior authorization form is developed, whichever is later, health insurers, managed care organizations, and fee-for-service medical assistance programs that provide prescription drug benefits shall utilize and accept the uniform prior authorization form and prescribing providers may use the uniform prior authorization form. Provides criteria for developing the uniform prior authorization form. Provides requirements and limitations of prior authorization requests. Effective immediately.
Title
DRUGS-PRIOR AUTHORIZATION FORM
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Tabled |
2019-02-28 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2019-02-25 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 364.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.12c | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2326&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2326.htm |