IL HB2450 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that it is an unlawful practice for a manufacturer or distributor of prescription contact lenses to prevent a retailer from selling or advertising contact lenses below any specified price.
Title
CONS FRAUD-CONTACT LENS PRICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2015-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2450&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB2450.htm |