IL HB2457 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a deduction for expenses paid or incurred by an eligible educator in connection with certain materials used by the educator in the classroom. Provides that the deduction may not exceed $500 in any taxable year. Provides that the deduction is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provision. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-EDUCATOR DEDUCTION
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-06 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2457&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB2457.htm |