IL HB2457 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State may issue special registration plates designated as Prostate Cancer license plates. Provides that the fee for a Prostate Cancer license plate, for the original issuance and renewal issuance of the plate, shall be $25.
Title
VEH CD-PROSTATE CANCER PLATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Tabled |
2019-04-03 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2457&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2457.htm |