IL HB2479 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Forest Preserve District Act. Provides that no new commissioners in DuPage County shall be elected on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Further provides that all commissioners elected and serving their terms prior to the effective date of the amendatory Act shall continue to constitute the board of commissioners until the general election held in 2016. Provides that following the general election held in 2016, the county board of commissioners shall constitute the board of commissioners for a forest preserve district in DuPage County and the president of the county board shall serve as president of the forest preserve district board. Provides that the president and forest preserve commissioners shall serve without compensation. Effective immediately.
Title
FOREST PRESERVE DISTRICT BOARD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 805 | 3c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2479&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2479.htm |