IL HB2504 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Allows a board of trustees of a community college district to enter into an agreement with an employer concerning an arrangement to provide new jobs training program services, including (1) new jobs training; (2) adult basic education and job-related instruction; (3) vocational and skill-assessment services and testing; (4) training facilities, equipment, materials, and supplies; and (5) on-the-job training. Requires the agreement to provide for program costs that may be paid from property taxes, tuition, student fees, or special charges. Allows the board to borrow money and issue and sell certificates payable from a sufficient portion of the future receipts of payments authorized by the agreement to provide funds for the present payment of the costs of a new jobs training program. Provides that the board shall, by resolution, provide for the assessment of an annual levy of a standby tax upon all taxable property within the community college district to further secure the payment of the certificates.
Title
COM COL-NEW JOBS TRAINING-BOND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eddie Washington |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2504&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB2504.htm |