IL HB2504 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Prevents the Illinois Commerce Commission from approving any increase in rates by a water or sewer service of greater than 15%. Requires these utilities to include notice of any proposed rate change on every bill sent to customers until the rate change is approved or denied. Allows customers who have had their rates increased by over 15% to file a civil action against the utility for damages in which the customers are certified as a class, are granted a rebuttable presumption that any increase in excess of 15% is unjustified, and are entitled to double damages as well as attorney's fees and costs. Entitles customers that have filed a class action against a water or sewer service utility for increasing their rates by over 15% to a temporary restraining order halting collection of the increase until the civil action is resolved.
Title
UTILITY RATE INCREASE CAP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Remains in Public Utilities Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Public Utilities Committee; 002-004-015 |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Esther Golar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 9-201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2504&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2504.htm |