IL HB2528 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Electric Service Customer Choice and Rate Relief Law of 1997 in the Public Utilities Act. Provides that an alternative retail electric supplier shall be responsible for procuring cost-effective renewable energy resources as required under specified provisions of the Act in a specified manner. Provides that an alternative retail electric supplier shall comply with the renewable energy portfolio standards by any one or a combination of specified means. Contains provisions concerning the use of renewable energy certificates. Contains provisions concerning alternative compliance payments for alternative retail electric suppliers. Provides that each alternative retail electric supplier shall, by September 1, 2011 and by September 1 of each year thereafter, prepare, and submit to the Illinois Commerce Commission a report that provides information certifying compliance by the alternative retail electric supplier with specified provisions. Provides that upon complaint or the Commission's own motion, the Commission may conduct a contested case to review allegations that the alternative retail electric supplier has violated specified provisions. Contains an exemption from specified requirements for electric utilities that meet certain criteria. Provides that biennially, the Commission shall submit to the General Assembly a report that discusses the status of renewable energy in the State and the effect of certain provisions on electricity prices and retail and wholesale electric markets.
Title
UTILITIES-RENEWABLE STDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2009-03-10 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed 067-040-004 | |
2009-03-10 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2528&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB2528.htm |