IL HB2531 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-31 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-31 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Defines "retired law enforcement officer qualified under federal law" for purposes of the Act to permit the carrying of a concealed weapon. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012, the Unified Code of Corrections, and the County Jail Act. Permits currently employed and qualified retired State correctional officers and county correctional officers to carry their own firearms off-duty without being in violation of the unlawful use of weapons and aggravated unlawful use of a weapon statutes if they meet certain training requirements. Provides that currently employed and qualified retired State correctional officers and county correctional officers shall carry a photographic identification and a valid annual firearm certificate while carrying their own firearms off-duty. Limited to correctional officers who have custody and control over inmates in an adult correctional facility. Effective immediately.
Title
CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS-FIREARMS
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] | Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Sen. Seth Lewis [R] |
Rep. Jeff Keicher [R] | Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] | Rep. Bradley Stephens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-31 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 705 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 125 | 26.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2531&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB2531.htm |