IL HB2534 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Prescription Drug Repository Program Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to establish a prescription drug repository program, under which a healthcare facility may donate a prescription drug or supplies needed to administer a prescription drug for use by an individual who meets eligibility criteria specified by the Department. Sets forth requirements that prescription drugs or supplies must meet in order to be accepted and dispensed under the program. Provides that no drugs or supplies donated under the prescription drug repository program may be resold. Provides that nothing in the Act requires that a pharmacy or pharmacist participate in the prescription drug repository program. Provides for civil and criminal immunity for drug and supply manufacturers and pharmacists in relation to the donation, acceptance, or dispensing of prescription drugs or supplies under the prescription drug repository program. Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act, the Wholesale Drug Distribution Licensing Act, the Senior Pharmaceutical Assistance Act, the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act, the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, and the Cannabis and Controlled Substances Tort Claims Act to provide that persons engaged in donating or accepting, or packaging, repackaging, or labeling, prescription drugs to the extent permitted or required under the Prescription Drug Repository Program Act are exempt from provisions of those other Acts that might prohibit or otherwise regulate such activity.
Title
IDPH-PRESCRIPT DRUG REPOSITORY
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 120 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 85 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
320 | 50 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 620 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 20 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2534&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2534.htm |