IL HB2744 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. In a Section providing that an agreement that addresses jurisdictional boundary lines shall be entirely unenforceable for a party to the agreement that subsequently enters into another agreement that addresses jurisdictional boundary lines that is in conflict with any of the terms of the first agreement without the consent of all parties to the first agreement, provides that it shall not be considered a conflict when a municipality that is a party to a jurisdictional boundary line agreement cedes property within its own jurisdiction to another municipality not a party to the same jurisdictional boundary line agreement. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-BOUNDARY LINE CONTRACT
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Andersson [R] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Jeanne Ives [R] | Rep. Al Riley [D] |
Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
Sen. Karen McConnaughay [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0292 |
2015-08-06 | House | Effective Date August 6, 2015 |
2015-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2015 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-03-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2015-03-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 007-000-000 |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2015-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-12-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |