IL HB2762 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Aeronautics Act, Illinois Vehicle Code, Snowmobile Registration and Safety Act, and Boat Registration and Safety Act. Allows use of saliva testing for the presence of alcohol or drugs for the purpose of enforcement of driving or operating a vehicle, snowmobile, watercraft, or aircraft under the influence offenses. Makes saliva tests admissible in certain proceedings. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 and Unified Code of Corrections to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
DUI SALIVA TESTING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2015-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |