IL HB2844 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Common Interest Community Association Act and the Condominium Property Act. Provides that if the condominium or community instruments require approval of any mortgagee or lienholder of record and the mortgagee or lienholder of record receives a request to approve or consent to the amendment to the condominium or community instruments, the mortgagee or lienholder of record is deemed to have approved or consented to the request unless the mortgagee or lienholder of record delivers a negative response to the requesting party within 35 days after the mailing of the request.
Title
CONDO/CICAA: BYLAWS-LIENHOLDER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-03-03 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee; (Reassigned) |
2017-02-24 | House | To Real & Personal Property Law Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 160 | 1-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |