IL HB2845 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that a Medicaid managed care plan amended, delivered, issued, or renewed after the effective date of the amendatory Act must provide individuals under 21 years of age coverage for the diagnosis of autism spectrum disorders and for the treatment of autism spectrum disorders to the extent that the diagnosis and treatment of autism spectrum disorders are not already covered by the Medicaid managed care plan. Provides that the coverage provided for the treatment of autism spectrum disorders shall not be subject to any limits on the number of visits to a service provider, but shall be subject to copayment, deductible, and coinsurance provisions of a Medicaid managed care plan to the extent that other medical services covered by the Medicaid managed care plan are subject to these provisions. Provides that the provisions of the amendatory Act shall not be construed as limiting benefits that are otherwise available to an individual under a Medicaid managed care plan and benefits provided under the amendatory Act may not be subject to dollar limits, deductibles, copayments, or coinsurance provisions that are less favorable to the insured than the dollar limits, deductibles, or coinsurance provisions that apply to physical illness generally. Requires a provider of treatment for autism spectrum disorders to furnish, upon request to the reimbursing managed care organization, medical records, clinical notes, or other necessary data that substantiate that initial or continued medical treatment is medically necessary and is resulting in improved clinical status. Defines terms. Makes other changes.
Title
MEDICAID-AUTISM SPECTRUM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-11-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 018-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2845&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2845.htm |