IL HB2881 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Chicago school district.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. David Reis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 005-009-002 | |
2009-03-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-03-27 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David Reis | |
2009-03-27 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-27 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Reis | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-04 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-03-03 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-24 | First Reading | |
2009-02-23 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2881&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB2881.htm |