IL HB2881 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Charitable Tax Exemption Act. Provides that not-for-profit corporations that are exempt from taxation under Sections 501(c) or 501(d) of the Internal Revenue Code or organized under the General Not For Profit Corporation Act of 1986 are exempt from any tax imposed by the State or any unit of local government. Preempts home rule powers.
Title
NON-PROFITS-TAX EXEMPT
Sponsors
Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] | Rep. Silvana Tabares [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
Rep. Arthur Turner [D] | Rep. Daniel Burke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2017-03-14 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-03-09 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2881&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2881.htm |