IL HB2898 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. In the statute creating the offense of criminal street gang recruitment on school grounds, defines "school grounds" to mean the property, including buildings and grounds, of a public or private elementary, secondary, or post-secondary school, or a public or private 2-year or 4-year institution of higher education; public property or property open to public use within 1,000 feet of school property; a school bus; a designated school bus stop; and public property or property open to public use which is within 1,000 feet of the school bus stop, during the time when school children are waiting to be picked up and transported to or are being dropped off from school or a school-sponsored activity. Expands the offense to include the commission of the crime in a public park. Defines "public park".
Title
CRIM CD-GANG RECRUITMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2014-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-01-03 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 7, 2013 |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 5, 2013 |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-004-000 |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As November 7, 2013 |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law; Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-05-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2013-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2013-03-12 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-03-12 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-03-12 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-6.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |