IL HB2898 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Removes the date (of June 30, 2021) until which a principal endorsement may be affixed to the Professional Educator License of a person who has, among other qualifications, at least 4 total years of experience working in the capacity of school support personnel. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-PRINCIPAL ENDORSEMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0267 |
2017-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2017 |
2017-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-001-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |