IL HB2899 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Alternate Fuels Act. Provides that the Act's purpose shall be to encourage the use of electric power (rather than alternate fuel) in vehicles for the purpose of reducing the risks from global warming. Eliminates defined terms. Removes provisions allowing the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to promulgate rules to implement a portion of the Act. Removes provisions specifying rules to be implemented. Eliminates original equipment manufacturer ("OEM") rebates and fuel cost differential rebates. Removes provisions concerning car sharing organizations.
Title
ENVIRONMENT-ALTERNATE FUELS
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Curtis Tarver [D] | Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-06 | House | To Renewable Initiatives Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 120 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 120 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 120 | 20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
415 | 120 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 120 | 24 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
415 | 120 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 120 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 120 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 120 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 120 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |