IL HB2909 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Wireless Telephone Customer Privacy Act. Prohibits the disclosure of customer proprietary network information. Defines terms. Provides exemptions for disclosure pursuant to law. Provides that a violation is a Class 2 felony. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that a violation of the Wireless Telephone Customer Privacy Act is an unlawful practice under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act.
Title
WIRELESS TELEPHONE PRIVACY ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Rep. Monique Davis [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] |
Rep. Al Riley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 011-001-000 |
2013-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Consumer Protection Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2013-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2013-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2Z | Amended Code | Citation Text |