IL HB2948 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0537
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0537
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Division of Professional Regulation shall employ one full-time employee as the licensing liaison for international applicants. Provides that the licensing liaison shall assist international applicants in answering questions and providing information regarding the foreign education requirements for licenses administered by the Division of Professional Regulation. Provides that the additional duties of the licensing liaison shall include, but are not limited to: (i) coordinating with personnel of the Department in processing the applications from international applicants and (ii) providing education and information resources to community organizations that assist international applicants.
Title
DFPR-OFFICE OF THE OMBUDSMAN
Sponsors
Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0537 |
2023-08-11 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-18 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2023 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-014-000 |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 |
2023-02-23 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |