IL HB2982 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Regional Integrated Behavioral Health Networks Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall establish Regional Integrated Behavioral Health Networks for the purpose of ensuring and improving access to appropriate mental health and substance abuse services throughout Illinois by providing a platform for the organization of all relevant health, mental health, substance abuse, and other community entities and a mechanism to use and channel financial and other resources efficiently and effectively. Provides that the goals of the Networks shall include, but not be limited to, enabling persons with mental and substance use illnesses to access clinically appropriate, evidence-based services, regardless of where they reside in the State and particularly in rural areas; and improving access to mental health and substance abuse services throughout Illinois, but especially in rural Illinois communities. Contains provisions concerning the establishment of a Steering Committee and Network Councils; the development of Regional Integrated Behavioral Health Network Plans, and the timeline for such plans; and required reports. Effective immediately.
Title
REGIONAL BEHAVIOR HEALTH NET
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0381 |
2011-08-15 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-18 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2011 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2011-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-03-31 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2011-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2011-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2011-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |