IL HB3083 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code, the Illinois Highway Code, and the Toll Highway Act. Provides that on and after January 1, 2015, 25% of all vehicles purchased with State funds shall be vehicles fueled by electricity, compressed natural gas, liquid petroleum gas, or liquid natural gas. Provides that by January 1, 2015, the Illinois Department of Transportation shall construct and maintain at least one electric vehicle charging station at each rest area on State highways. Provides that by January 1, 2015, the Toll Highway Authority shall construct and maintain at least one electric vehicle charging station at any location where the Authority has entered into an agreement with any entity for the purposes of providing motor fuel service stations and facilities, garages, stores, or restaurants along the toll highways. Directs the Department and Authority to adopt rules to implement these requirements.
Title
ALT FUEL CARS/CHARGE STATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 25-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
605 | 10 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
605 | 5 | 4-221 | New Code | See Bill Text |