IL HB3083 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to provide by rule for the establishment of a list of self-excluded persons who may request to be placed on the list and are prohibited from entering a dispensary or purchasing any product or service at a dispensary. Provides that the rules must establish specified procedures regarding the list and require dispensaries to establish procedures designed to remove self-excluded persons from targeted mailings or other forms of advertising or promotions and deny self-excluded persons entry and access to the dispensary and the products and services provided by the dispensary. Prohibits dispensaries from allowing entry to or serving any person who is on the self-exclusion list. Provides that the list of self-excluded persons shall be exempt from public inspection, copying, and disclosure, except for the limited purpose of assisting in the proper administration of procedures established under the amendatory Act. Allows the Department of Public Health to adopt rules requiring a dispensing organization to use a purchaser's identification to check whether the purchaser is on the self-exclusion list. Provides that allowing entry to or serving any person who is on the self-exclusion list is grounds for discipline by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Makes a conforming change in the Freedom of Information Act. Effective immediately.
Title
CANNABIS-SELF-EXCLUSION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 705 | 10-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 705 | 15-145 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 705 | 15-73 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3083&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3083.htm |