IL HB3100 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Officials Convicted of Infamous Crimes Act, Election Code, Township Code, Illinois Municipal Code, Park District Code, and School Code. In each of the affected Acts, defines the term "infamous crime" to mean any one or more of the following offenses, as the context requires: arson, residential arson, place of worship arson, aggravated arson, bigamy, bribery, burglary, residential burglary, aggravated criminal sexual assault, criminal sexual assault, predatory criminal sexual assault of a child, subsequent conviction for criminal sexual abuse, aggravated criminal sexual abuse, indecent solicitation of a child, child pornography, aggravated child pornography, forgery, kidnapping or aggravated kidnaping, first degree murder, perjury, robbery, armed robbery, aggravated robbery, sale of controlled substances, subornation of perjury, terrorism, luring of a minor, trafficking in persons, involuntary servitude, theft that results in a felony conviction, or any similar offense. Also makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
STATUTES-INFAMOUS CRIME
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 29-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 1-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 280 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 170-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 60-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 1-1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 1205 | 1-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |