IL HB3147 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that if a change is made concerning regular meeting dates, times, or locations (currently, only change in dates), at least 10 days' notice of such change shall be given by publication in a newspaper of general circulation in the area in which such body functions.
Title
OPEN MEETINGS ACT-NOTICE
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] |
Rep. Chris Miller [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 2.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |