IL HB3149 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that the Commerce Commission may require gas utilities to keep accounts that reflect depreciation and other specified information. Effective immediately.
Title
GAS/ELECTRIC DEPRECIATION
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Michael Tryon [R] | Rep. Tom Cross [R] | Rep. James Durkin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2014-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross |
2014-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2014-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2014-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 5-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3149&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3149.htm |