IL HB3149 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Defines "drug and alcohol clearinghouse" as a database system established by the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration that permits the access and retrieval of a drug and alcohol testing violation or violations precluding an applicant or employee from occupying safety-sensitive positions involving the operation of a commercial motor vehicle. Provides that, no later than November 18, 2024, the Secretary shall request information from the drug and alcohol clearinghouse for all applicants applying for an initial, renewal, transfer, or upgraded commercial driver's license or commercial learner's permit, and enforce federal regulations pertaining to the clearinghouse. Provides that a commercial learner's permit is valid for 12 months (instead of 6 months with a 6-month renewal). Provides that certificates of insurance and notices of cancellation or termination of insurance shall be submitted to the Secretary of State electronically (instead of in written or electronic form). Sets forth additional requirements for certain vehicles when approaching or stopping at railroad grade crossings, railroad tracks or tracks at grades, or highway rail grade crossings. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0179 |
2023-06-30 | House | Effective Date June 30, 2023 |
2023-06-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-10 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2023 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2023-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-1201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-1202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-1425 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-507.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-508.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 6-514 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 7-315 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 7-318 | Amended Code | Citation Text |