IL HB3154 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for taxable years 2021 and thereafter, the maximum reduction under the senior citizens homestead exemption is $9,000 in all counties (currently, $8,000 in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants and $5,000 in all other counties). Provides that the maximum income limitation for the senior citizens assessment freeze homestead exemption is $75,000 (currently, $65,000). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TAX-SENIOR HOMESTEAD
Sponsors
Rep. Janet Yang Rohr [D] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Eva Dina Delgado [D] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] |
Rep. Robert Rita [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] | Rep. Lance Yednock [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-10-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-09-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2021-09-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2021-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3154&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3154.htm |