IL HB3181 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that, on and after January 1, 2018, no person may knowingly cause or allow sale at wholesale or retail of a coal tar sealant product. Provides that, on and after July 1, 2019, no person may knowingly cause or allow application of a coal tar sealant product on any surface, except for highway structures, in the State of Illinois including but not limited to a driveway, parking area, playground, sidewalk, bike trail or roadway. Provides that a city or county may adopt ordinances providing for enforcement of the requirements of this provision. Provides that any violation of this provision shall be enforceable by administrative citation. Provides that penalties for violation may not exceed $1,000 for the first offense and $5,000 for the second offense. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-COAL TAR BAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | To Environmental Regulations Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3181&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3181.htm |