IL HB3181 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, in determining the fair cash value of a low-income housing project (Section 42 properties), the assessment officer must consider the actual or projected net operating income attributable to the property, capitalized at rates for similarly encumbered Section 42 properties. Provides that the owner or owners of the low-income housing project must certify to the appropriate local assessment officer that the owner or owners qualify for the low-income housing tax credit under Section 42 of the Internal Revenue Code for the property.
Title
PROP TX-LOW INCOME HOUSING
Sponsors
Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 10-260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |