IL HB3223 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0482
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0482
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Prevailing Wage Act. Requires contractors to include in record keeping the gross and net wage, hourly overtime rate, fringe benefit rates, and the sponsor and administrator of fringe benefit plans. Provides for filing of the records with the Department of Labor. Authorizes that Department to require electronic filing. Requires that Department to create and provide a form for the filing of certified payrolls. Defines terms.
Title
PREVAIL WAGE RECORDS IDOL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0482 |
2013-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 035-019-000 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Verified |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Labor and Commerce; 009-004-000 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Labor and Commerce |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Labor and Commerce |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-038-001 |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 012-006-000 |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2013-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 130 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 130 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 130 | 5.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |