IL HB3237 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0571
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Prevailing Wage Act. Provides that contractors and subcontractors participating in public works shall keep records for at least three years from the date of the last payment on a contract or subcontract. Also provides that such contractors and subcontractors shall file a certified payroll for each month signed by the contractor or subcontractor or an officer, employee, or agent of the contractor or subcontractor and stating that he or she has examined the certified payroll records. Provides that when these specified individuals willfully fail to file or willfully file a false certified payroll, false as to a material fact, they are guilty of a Class 4 felony. Provides that a contractor or subcontractor shall make records available for inspection and copying, upon 3 business days' notice (instead of 7), to federal, State or local law enforcement agencies and prosecutors in addition to the public body in charge of the public works project and the Director of Labor and his deputies and agents. Provides that any contractor or subcontractor and any officer, employee or agent thereof who willfully fails to create, keep, maintain or produce a record or document required by the Prevailing Wage Act is guilty of a Class 4 felony. Provides that a contractor or subcontractor convicted under specific provisions of the Act shall be subject to an automatic and immediate debarment, thereafter prohibited from participating in any public works project for 4 years, with no right to a hearing. Effective January 1, 2012.
Title
PREVAILING WAGE - PUBLIC WORKS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 74 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0571 |
2011-08-25 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 074-042-000 |
2011-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2011-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2011-05-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-019-000 |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 007-000-000 |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2011-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1) - Referred to Labor |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 009-000-000 |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2011-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2011-04-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2011-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2011 |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 067-049-000 |
2011-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2011-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2011-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2011-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke |
2011-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire |
2011-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2011-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Labor Committee; 011-008-000 |
2011-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2011-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2011-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2011-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Osterman |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2011-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Cunningham |
2011-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2011-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
2011-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2011-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2011-02-28 | House | Assigned to Labor Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 130 | 11a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 130 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 130 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |