IL HB3317 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the McHenry County Equitable Standards and Governmental Efficiency Law in the Counties Code. Allows the county board to require the election of specified special district trustees that it appoints. Allows the county board chairperson to: eliminate advisory committees or commissions; create standing committees and appoint members; set county board or committee meeting agendas; have line-item veto powers; and hire independent legal counsel or a parliamentarian or both; approve all appropriation expenditures before they are paid; reduce or divert moneys from a county fund with assets exceeding 150% of the previous year's expenditures on a ratable basis to taxpayers. Allows the county board to appoint an inspector general to investigate waste, fraud, and abuse. Provides that, on the effective date of the amendatory Act, the elected chairperson of the county board is a county office distinct from the county board. Terminates the office of county recorder and the office of the county auditor. Amends the Local Government Reduction and Efficiency Division of the Counties Code. Provides that a county board may prohibit or limit a unit of local government that it has proposed to consolidate from starting a capital program, building project, or land acquisition for a set period of time, not to exceed 2 years, while the county board pursues possible consolidation. Effective immediately.
Title
MCHENRY COUNTY-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-09 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-04-09 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 012-002-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-02-19 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-44065 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45001 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45005 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45010 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45015 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45020 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45025 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45030 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45035 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45040 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45045 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45050 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45055 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45060 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45065 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45070 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | Div. 5-45 headin | New Code | See Bill Text |