IL HB3481 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Kyoto Protocol Act of 1998. Effective immediately.
Title
KYOTO PROTOCOL OF 1998
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0373 |
2019-08-15 | House | Effective Date August 15, 2019 |
2019-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-017-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 005-002-000 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-044-001 |
2019-03-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 016-010-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 140 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |