IL HB3592 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Medicare Supplement Insurance Act. Sets forth the purpose of the Act.
Title
INS - MEDICARE SUPP INS ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-03-03 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-24 | First Reading | |
2009-02-23 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-02-23 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3592&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB3592.htm |