IL HB3625 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-17)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-17)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates specified amounts to the Department on Aging for grants and for administrative expenses associated with the purchase of services covered by the Community Care Program; for payment of Community Care Program costs incurred in prior years; for grants and for administrative expenses associated with Capitated Care Coordination; and for grants and for administrative expenses associated with Comprehensive Case Coordination. Effective July 1, 2013.
Title
$AGING-COMM CARE-CAPITATD CARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2013-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2013-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2013-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2013-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi |
2013-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2013-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2013-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Meier |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Josh Harms |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3625&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/PDF/09800HB3625.pdf |