IL HB3625 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that beginning with the budget prepared for fiscal year 2023, the rate of growth of general funds appropriations shall not exceed the rate of growth of the Illinois median household income. Defines "rate of growth of the Illinois median household income".
Title
STATE BUDGET-RATE OF GROWTH
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Jeff Keicher [R] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] |
Rep. Mark Luft [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 20 | 50-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |