IL HB3664 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0522
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0522
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In counties of less than 3,000,000, provides that if an owner fails to file an application for any homestead exemption (instead of only the senior assessment freeze), a certificate of error may be issued. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TAX-CERT OF ERROR
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Thomas Holbrook [D] | Rep. Eddie Jackson [D] |
Rep. Naomi Jakobsson [D] | Rep. Kathleen Ryg [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Arthur Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-14 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0522 | |
2009-08-14 | Effective Date August 14, 2009 | |
2009-08-14 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-18 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-05-18 | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2009 | |
2009-05-15 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Held in Revenue | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue | |
2009-05-06 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-06 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2009-05-06 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Bond | |
2009-05-06 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-05-05 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-05-05 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-04-30 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy | |
2009-04-30 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2009-04-30 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner | |
2009-04-30 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Brady | |
2009-04-30 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link | |
2009-04-24 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 28, 2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Do Pass Revenue; 006-000-000 | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to Revenue | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-26 | First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen A. Ryg | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay C. Hoffman | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000 | |
2009-03-12 | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-03-12 | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2009-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2009-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2009-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-24 | First Reading | |
2009-02-24 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |