IL HB3696 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Requires the Department of Human Services to establish reimbursement rates that build toward livable wages for front-line personnel in residential and day programs and service coordination agencies that serve persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities, including, but not limited to, intermediate care facilities for persons with developmental disabilities, community-integrated living arrangements, developmental training and employment programs, and other residential and day programs for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities that are supported by State funds or funding under Title XIX of the Social Security Act. Requires the Department to increase rates and reimbursements so that direct support persons earn a base wage of not less than $15 per hour and so that other front-line personnel earn a commensurate wage. Defines "front-line personnel". Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that for all facilities licensed by the Department of Public Health under the ID/DD Community Care Act as intermediate care facilities for persons with developmental disabilities and under the MC/DD Act as medically complex for the developmentally disabled facilities, the payment rate shall be increased to fund rates and reimbursements so that direct support persons earn a base wage of not less than $15 per hour and so that other front-line personnel earn a commensurate wage.
Title
DHS-MENTAL HLTH-WAGE INCREASE
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 55.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.4i | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3696&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3696.htm |