IL HB3701 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that if an Executive Inspector General determines that conduct at issue in a summary report resulted in the loss of public funds in an amount of $5,000 or more, then the Commission must make the report, or a redacted version of the report, available to the public. Authorizes the Commission to redact information in a report if it determines that the identity of any person named in the report is unnecessary. Provides that, prior to publication, the Commission shall permit the Executive Inspector General (rather than the Inspector General) to review documents to be made public and offer suggestions for redaction or provide a response that shall be made public with the summary report.
Title
ETHICS-REPORT PUBLICATION
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties, and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 20-52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3701&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3701.htm |