IL HB3827 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Requires the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to establish a grant program for volunteer firefighters or volunteer EMS personnel who are enrolled in an associate degree program at a public community college. Sets forth eligibility requirements. Requires a grant recipient not to have an outstanding balance with the public community college and to maintain satisfactory academic progress to remain eligible for grant assistance. Provides that the grant may be renewed for up to a total of 2 years of full-time enrollment. Provides for rulemaking. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-FIREFIGHTER GRANT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2023-03-10 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3827&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB3827.htm |