IL HB3881 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Electronic Products Recycling and Reuse Act. Provides that the Environmental Protection Agency shall (rather than has the authority to) monitor compliance with the Act. Provides that the Agency shall perform a quarterly review of specified items that are collected by collectors, processed by recyclers and refurbishers, and assigned to manufacturers. Provides that the Agency shall publish the results of the quarterly review on its website that shall include specified information. Makes corresponding changes requiring manufacturers, recyclers and refurbishers, and collectors to submit quarterly reports of specified information to the Agency.
Title
ELECTRONIC PRODUCTS RECYCLING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 150 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 150 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 150 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 150 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3881&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3881.htm |