IL HB3900 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that after high school graduation, an eligible student may attend any community college in the State without paying tuition or the cost of books. Provides that costs shall only be waived after any available federal student aid is applied. Defines "eligible student" to mean a student who has graduated from the Chicago school district with a grade point average of at least 3.0 and who has tested as completion-ready in English language arts and mathematics.
Title
COMM COLLEGES-TUITION WAIVER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Community College Access & Affordability Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3900&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3900.htm |