IL HB3933 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act in the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the joint review board shall appoint one of its members to preside over certain public hearings.
Title
TIF-PUBLIC HEARING
Sponsors
Rep. Sandy Cole [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-02-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sandy Cole |
2012-02-07 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2012-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2011-12-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandy Cole |