IL HB4056 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Maternal Health and Well-being Workgroup Act. Sets forth the purpose, findings, and definitions. Requires the Department of Public Health's Office of Women's Health and Family Services' Division of Maternal, Child and Family Health Services to create the Maternal Health and Well-being Workgroup to research and highlight the disparities between maternal health care throughout various geographic areas in the State, as well as work on making recommendations on connecting pregnant women and new mothers, particularly in rural and underserved areas, with resources for the health and well-being of the mother and child. Establishes members, appointments, quorum, meeting frequency, compensation, and administrative support. Requires the Workgroup to submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly by July 1, 2025. Dissolves the Workgroup and repeals the Act on January 1, 2027.
Title
MATERNAL HLTH WORKGROUP ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Jackie Haas [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Nicole La Ha [R] |
Rep. Ryan Spain [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee |
2024-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-01-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2023-05-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-02 | House | First Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-05-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4056&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4056.htm |